Senate
|
02/01/2022
|
Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2021
|
May 20 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2021
|
Set for hearing May 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2021
|
May 17 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2021
|
Set for hearing May 17.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2021
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2021
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 985.) (April 29).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2021
|
Set for hearing April 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2021
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. (Ayes 11. Noes 1. Page 756.) (April 12).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2021
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2021
|
Set for hearing April 12.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2021
|
March 15 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2021
|
Set for hearing March 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2021
|
Referral to Com. on JUD. rescinded because of the limitations placed on committee hearings due to ongoing health and safety risks of the COVID-19 virus.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2021
|
Referred to Coms. on E., U. & C., EQ., and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/15/2021
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 14.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/14/2021
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|