|
10/08/2021
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 675, Statutes of 2021.
|
|
|
|
10/08/2021
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2021
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2021
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2387.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/02/2021
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/02/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 72. Noes 1. Page 2717.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2021
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2021
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 26).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2021
|
August 19 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/13/2021
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/12/2021
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 7).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/10/2021
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2021
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1349.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2021
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2021
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1183.) (May 20).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2021
|
Set for hearing May 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2021
|
April 5 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2021
|
Set for hearing April 5.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2021
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 667.) (March 10).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2021
|
Set for hearing March 10.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/15/2021
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 14.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/14/2021
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|