|
10/01/2021
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 446, Statutes of 2021.
|
|
|
|
10/01/2021
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2021
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/02/2021
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/02/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2701.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 26).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/08/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2021
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/25/2021
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 611.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2021
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2021
|
Set for hearing March 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 456.) (March 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2021
|
Set for hearing March 10.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2021
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/15/2021
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|