Senate | 02/01/2022 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 05/20/2021 | May 20 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Senate | 05/14/2021 | Set for hearing May 20. | ||
Senate | 05/10/2021 | May 10 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. | ||
Senate | 05/04/2021 | Set for hearing May 10. | ||
Senate | 04/29/2021 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/28/2021 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 954.) (April 28). | ||
Senate | 04/16/2021 | Set for hearing April 28. | ||
Senate | 04/15/2021 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Senate | 04/14/2021 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on ED. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 795.) (April 14). | ||
Senate | 03/26/2021 | Set for hearing April 14. | ||
Senate | 03/18/2021 | Re-referred to Coms. on HEALTH and ED. | ||
Senate | 03/09/2021 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 01/28/2021 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 01/20/2021 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 19. | ||
Senate | 01/19/2021 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |