California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB23 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 7, 2020

Enrolled

Bill September 7, 2021

Chaptered

Bill October 4, 2021

Amended

Bill July 7, 2021
Bill March 18, 2021