|
09/28/2022
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 676, Statutes of 2022.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2022
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2022
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2022
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 5276.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2022
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2022
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2022
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2022
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2022
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2022
|
August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/28/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/22/2022
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/14/2022
|
June 14 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2022
|
Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/26/2022
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2821.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2022
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 2794.) (January 20).
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2022
|
Set for hearing January 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2022
|
January 18 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/07/2022
|
Set for hearing January 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/03/2022
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2021
|
March 22 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2021
|
Set for hearing March 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 500.) (March 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2021
|
Set for hearing March 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2021
|
Referred to Com. on EQ.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2021
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2021
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|