Assembly
|
08/11/2022
|
August 11 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2022
|
August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 15). Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2022
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2022
|
Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and HUM. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/06/2022
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/06/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 2723.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/04/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/03/2022
|
Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/03/2022
|
From inactive file on motion of Senator Wiener.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2021
|
Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Wiener.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1184.) (May 20).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2021
|
Set for hearing May 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2021
|
May 3 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2021
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2021
|
Set for hearing May 3.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 814.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2021
|
Set for hearing April 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2021
|
April 29 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2021
|
Set for hearing April 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HOUSING. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 422.) (March 9). Re-referred to Com. on HOUSING.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2021
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2021
|
Set for hearing March 9.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2021
|
Referred to Coms. on HUMAN S. and HOUSING.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2021
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2021
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|