Senate | 02/01/2022 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 04/21/2021 | April 20 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 9. Page 858.) Reconsideration granted. | ||
Senate | 04/06/2021 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Senate | 04/06/2021 | Set for hearing April 20. | ||
Senate | 02/03/2021 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Senate | 01/22/2021 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 21. | ||
Senate | 01/21/2021 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |