|
10/07/2021
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 635, Statutes of 2021.
|
|
|
|
10/07/2021
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2021
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2021
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2210.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2021
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 2478.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2021
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2021
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2021
|
From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Reyes.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/15/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/14/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (July 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/28/2021
|
Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. (Ayes 56. Noes 19. Page 2124.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/25/2021
|
June 28 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/09/2021
|
June 14 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2021
|
Referred to Com. on B. & F.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/25/2021
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 612.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2021
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2021
|
Set for hearing March 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 455.) (March 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2021
|
Set for hearing March 10.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2021
|
Referred to Com. on B. & F.I.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2021
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2021
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|