Senate | 02/01/2022 | Died on file pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 06/01/2021 | Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Eggman. | ||
Senate | 05/20/2021 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/20/2021 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1184.) (May 20). | ||
Senate | 05/14/2021 | Set for hearing May 20. | ||
Senate | 04/20/2021 | April 19 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. | ||
Senate | 04/06/2021 | Set for hearing April 19. | ||
Senate | 03/25/2021 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 633.) (March 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 03/11/2021 | Set for hearing March 25. | ||
Senate | 03/10/2021 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | ||
Senate | 02/03/2021 | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | ||
Senate | 01/22/2021 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 21. | ||
Senate | 01/21/2021 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |