Senate | 02/01/2022 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 04/21/2021 | April 20 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 9. Page 859.) Reconsideration granted. | ||
Senate | 04/06/2021 | Set for hearing April 20. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2021 | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) | ||
Senate | 02/22/2021 | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) | ||
Senate | 02/22/2021 | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. | ||
Senate | 02/03/2021 | Referred to Coms. on JUD. and ED. | ||
Senate | 01/26/2021 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 25. | ||
Senate | 01/25/2021 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |