|
07/16/2021
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 102, Statutes of 2021.
|
|
|
|
07/16/2021
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2021
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2021
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/01/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2206.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/24/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/23/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 23).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2021
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/25/2021
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 611.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 668.) (March 17).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2021
|
Set for hearing March 17.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2021
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
(Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2021
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2021
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2021
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|