California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB263 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 27, 2021

Enrolled

Bill September 13, 2021

Chaptered

Bill September 28, 2021

Amended

Bill August 30, 2021
Bill June 28, 2021