|
10/08/2021
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 673, Statutes of 2021.
|
|
|
|
10/08/2021
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/17/2021
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/09/2021
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2591.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2021
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 2909.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2021
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2021
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 26).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2021
|
August 19 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/05/2021
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/01/2021
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 1).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/24/2021
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/23/2021
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 23).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2021
|
Referred to Coms. on C. & C. and P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2021
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 1236.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1179.) (May 20).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2021
|
Set for hearing May 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2021
|
May 17 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2021
|
Set for hearing May 17.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2021
|
May 10 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2021
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2021
|
Set for hearing May 10.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2021
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 856.) (April 20).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2021
|
Set for hearing April 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on G.O. (Ayes 14. Noes 0. Page 755.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2021
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2021
|
Set for hearing April 12.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2021
|
Re-referred to Coms. on E., U. & C. and G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2021
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2021
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/08/2020
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 7.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/07/2020
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|