California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB283 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 1, 2021

Enrolled

Bill July 9, 2021

Chaptered

Bill July 23, 2021

Amended

Bill June 8, 2021
Bill March 10, 2021