Assembly
|
08/11/2022
|
August 11 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2022
|
August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on ED. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 15). Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2022
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ELECTIONS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2022
|
Referred to Coms. on ELECTIONS and ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/26/2022
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 30. Noes 7. Page 2820.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 2794.) (January 20).
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2022
|
Set for hearing January 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2022
|
January 18 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/14/2022
|
Set for hearing January 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/13/2022
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/13/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 2761.) (January 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E. & C.A. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 2753.) (January 12). Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/07/2022
|
Set for hearing January 13 in E. & C.A. pending receipt.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/06/2022
|
Set for hearing January 12.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/03/2022
|
Re-referred to Coms. on ED. and E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/03/2022
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/03/2022
|
Withdrawn from committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/03/2022
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2021
|
April 12 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2021
|
Set for hearing April 12.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2021
|
March 15 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2021
|
Set for hearing March 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
(Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2021
|
Referred to Coms. on E. & C.A. and GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2021
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 4.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2021
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|