|
02/19/2021
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 3, Statutes of 2021.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2021
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2021
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10:30 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2021
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2021
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 55. Noes 15. Page 332.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/10/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/09/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (February 9).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/01/2021
|
Referred to Com. on ELECTIONS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/01/2021
|
Pursuant to Assembly Rule 51.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/28/2021
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2021
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 7. Page 119.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 95.) (January 21).
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2021
|
Set for hearing January 21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/15/2021
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/14/2021
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 72.) (January 14).
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2021
|
Set for hearing January 14.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2021
|
Referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/08/2020
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 7.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/07/2020
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|