|
09/28/2021
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 340, Statutes of 2021.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2021
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2021
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2021
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 2211.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2021
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 66. Noes 1. Page 2478.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2021
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2021
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/15/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/14/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (July 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/01/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (June 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/23/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2021
|
Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2021
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 4. Page 1232.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1186.) (May 20).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2021
|
Set for hearing May 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2021
|
May 3 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2021
|
Set for hearing May 3.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 814.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2021
|
Set for hearing April 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 552.) (March 18). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2021
|
Set for hearing March 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
(Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2021
|
Referred to Coms. on HOUSING and GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2021
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 4.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2021
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|