|
10/07/2021
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 637, Statutes of 2021.
|
|
|
|
10/07/2021
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2021
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2021
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2602.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 26).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/14/2021
|
July 14 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/10/2021
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2021
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1336.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2021
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2021
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1186.) (May 20).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2021
|
Set for hearing May 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2021
|
April 5 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2021
|
Set for hearing April 5.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 592.) (March 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2021
|
Set for hearing March 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
(Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/04/2021
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 6.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2021
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|