|
07/16/2021
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 103, Statutes of 2021.
|
|
|
|
07/16/2021
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2021
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/08/2021
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/08/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2278.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/01/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 30).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/08/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2021
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/25/2021
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 612.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2021
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2021
|
Set for hearing March 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 422.) (March 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2021
|
Set for hearing March 9.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
(Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2021
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 7.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/04/2021
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|