Assembly | 06/03/2021 | Referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2021 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/28/2021 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 3. Page 1281.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 05/24/2021 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/20/2021 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | ||
Senate | 05/20/2021 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 1187.) (May 20). | ||
Senate | 05/14/2021 | Set for hearing May 20. | ||
Senate | 03/22/2021 | March 22 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. | ||
Senate | 03/12/2021 | Set for hearing March 22. | ||
Senate | 03/10/2021 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 668.) (March 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 02/23/2021 | Set for hearing March 10. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2021 | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) | ||
Senate | 02/22/2021 | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) | ||
Senate | 02/22/2021 | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. | ||
Senate | 02/05/2021 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 7. | ||
Senate | 02/04/2021 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |