Assembly
|
09/09/2021
|
Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Reyes.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 26).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2021
|
August 19 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/23/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/23/2021
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/10/2021
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2021
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1343.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2021
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1187.) (May 20).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2021
|
Set for hearing May 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2021
|
March 22 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2021
|
Set for hearing March 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 457.) (March 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2021
|
Set for hearing March 10.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
(Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2021
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 7.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/04/2021
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|