Senate | 02/01/2022 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 05/20/2021 | May 20 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Senate | 05/14/2021 | Set for hearing May 20. | ||
Senate | 05/04/2021 | May 3 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. | ||
Senate | 04/21/2021 | Set for hearing May 3. | ||
Senate | 04/15/2021 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 813.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/08/2021 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | ||
Senate | 04/06/2021 | Set for hearing April 15. | ||
Senate | 01/28/2021 | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | ||
Senate | 12/08/2020 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 7. | ||
Senate | 12/07/2020 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |