Assembly | 06/14/2022 | June 14 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2022 | June 8 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 05/05/2022 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Assembly | 01/26/2022 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 01/26/2022 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 6. Page 2818.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 01/13/2022 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 01/12/2022 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 2747.) (January 11). | ||
Senate | 01/04/2022 | Set for hearing January 11. | ||
Senate | 04/19/2021 | April 27 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 03/26/2021 | Set for hearing April 27. | ||
Senate | 03/18/2021 | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Senate | 03/10/2021 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2021 | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) | ||
Senate | 02/22/2021 | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) | ||
Senate | 02/22/2021 | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. | ||
Senate | 02/17/2021 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 02/08/2021 | Read first time. | ||
Senate | 02/08/2021 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 10. | ||
Senate | 02/05/2021 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |