Assembly | 06/17/2021 | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2021 | June 8 hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2021 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Assembly | 05/13/2021 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Assembly | 03/22/2021 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 03/22/2021 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 569.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 03/11/2021 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 03/10/2021 | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 423.) (March 9). | ||
Senate | 03/01/2021 | Set for hearing March 9. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2021 | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) | ||
Senate | 02/22/2021 | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) | ||
Senate | 02/22/2021 | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. | ||
Senate | 02/08/2021 | Read first time. | ||
Senate | 02/08/2021 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 10. | ||
Senate | 02/05/2021 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |