|
10/07/2021
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 638, Statutes of 2021.
|
|
|
|
10/07/2021
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2021
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2021
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 30. Noes 8. Page 2214.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2021
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 58. Noes 13. Page 2515.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2021
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2021
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/24/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/23/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 22).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/09/2021
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/08/2021
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (June 8).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2021
|
Referred to Coms. on JUD. and L. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2021
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 8. Page 1036.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2021
|
Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2021
|
Withdrawn from committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2021
|
May 3 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2021
|
Set for hearing May 3.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2021
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2021
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2. Page 775.) (April 13).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2021
|
Set for hearing April 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2021
|
March 23 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2021
|
Set for hearing March 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2021
|
Referred to Coms. on JUD. and APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
(Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2021
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 11.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2021
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|