Senate
|
01/31/2022
|
Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 19. Noes 8. Page 2844.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2022
|
From inactive file on motion of Senator Gonzalez.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2022
|
Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2021
|
Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Gonzalez.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2021
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 3. Noes 1. Page 1044.) (May 6).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2021
|
Set for hearing May 6.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2021
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 757.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2021
|
Set for hearing April 12.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2021
|
Re-referred to Coms. on E.Q. and GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2021
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
(Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2021
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2021
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 12.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2021
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|