California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB347 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 9, 2021

Enrolled

Bill July 12, 2021

Chaptered

Bill July 16, 2021

Amended

Bill March 17, 2021
Bill March 7, 2021