|
09/27/2021
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 318, Statutes of 2021.
|
|
|
|
09/27/2021
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/17/2021
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/09/2021
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 29. Noes 5. Page 2545.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2021
|
From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 2538.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2021
|
Set for hearing September 8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2021
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 2418.) Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/02/2021
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/02/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 61. Noes 13. Page 2691.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (August 31).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on ELECTIONS pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2021
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2021
|
Read third time and amended. (Ayes 59. Noes 15. Page 2513.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 19).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/15/2021
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/14/2021
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 13).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2021
|
June 29 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/17/2021
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/16/2021
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 16).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2021
|
Referred to Coms. on ELECTIONS and PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/10/2021
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 2. Page 1056.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2021
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2021
|
Set for hearing May 3.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 778.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2021
|
Set for hearing April 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2021
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2021
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 498.) (March 15).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2021
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2021
|
Set for hearing March 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2021
|
Referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/08/2020
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 7.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/07/2020
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|