Senate | 02/01/2022 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). | ||
Senate | 01/11/2022 | January 11 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 1. Noes 4. Page 2747.) | ||
Senate | 01/04/2022 | Set for hearing January 11. | ||
Senate | 03/23/2021 | March 23 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 1. Noes 1. Page 592.) Reconsideration granted. | ||
Senate | 03/15/2021 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Senate | 03/03/2021 | Set for hearing March 23. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2021 | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) | ||
Senate | 02/22/2021 | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) | ||
Senate | 02/22/2021 | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. | ||
Senate | 02/17/2021 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Senate | 02/10/2021 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 12. | ||
Senate | 02/09/2021 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |