California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB369 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 10, 2021

Enrolled

Bill September 7, 2021

Chaptered

Bill September 23, 2021

Amended

Bill June 14, 2021
Bill May 24, 2021