|
07/19/2022
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 132, Statutes of 2022.
|
|
|
|
07/19/2022
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2022
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2022
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5639.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/23/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/22/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 22).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/14/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2022
|
Referred to Com. on W.,P., & W.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/06/2022
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/06/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 2723.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/04/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/03/2022
|
Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/03/2022
|
From inactive file on motion of Senator Dodd.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2021
|
Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Dodd.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2021
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2021
|
From consent calendar on motion of Senator Dodd.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2021
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2021
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2021
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 938.) (April 27).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2021
|
Set for hearing April 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2021
|
April 15 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2021
|
Set for hearing April 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
(Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2021
|
Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2021
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2021
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|