California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB374 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 10, 2021

Enrolled

Bill July 14, 2021

Chaptered

Bill July 23, 2021

Amended

Bill April 20, 2021
Bill March 15, 2021
Bill March 5, 2021