Senate | 02/01/2022 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 05/20/2021 | May 20 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Senate | 05/14/2021 | Set for hearing May 20. | ||
Senate | 04/05/2021 | April 5 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. | ||
Senate | 03/24/2021 | Set for hearing April 5. | ||
Senate | 03/24/2021 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 592.) (March 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 03/03/2021 | Set for hearing March 23. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2021 | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) | ||
Senate | 02/22/2021 | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) | ||
Senate | 02/22/2021 | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. | ||
Senate | 02/17/2021 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Senate | 02/11/2021 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 13. | ||
Senate | 02/10/2021 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |