|
10/09/2021
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 765, Statutes of 2021.
|
|
|
|
10/09/2021
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2021
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2021
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2606.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 26).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/08/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (July 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2021
|
Referred to Com. on C. & C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/05/2021
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 658.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2021
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2021
|
Set for hearing March 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0. Page 499.) (March 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2021
|
Set for hearing March 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2021
|
Referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
(Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2021
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 14.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2021
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|