|
10/04/2021
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 489, Statutes of 2021.
|
|
|
|
10/04/2021
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2021
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/02/2021
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 29. Noes 9. Page 2358.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2021
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 61. Noes 14. Page 2624.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2021
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2021
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (August 26).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2021
|
August 19 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/15/2021
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/14/2021
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 2.) (July 13).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/22/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/10/2021
|
Referred to Coms. on REV. & TAX. and HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2021
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 8. Page 1335.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 1190.) (May 20).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2021
|
Set for hearing May 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2021
|
May 17 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2021
|
Set for hearing May 17.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2021
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2. Page 955.) (April 28).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2021
|
Set for hearing April 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2021
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2021
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 727.) (April 8).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2021
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2021
|
Set for hearing April 8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2021
|
Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
(Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2021
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 14.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2021
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|