Assembly
|
08/16/2021
|
August 19 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/07/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (July 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/07/2021
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/28/2021
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/22/2021
|
June 22 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/03/2021
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2021
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 1. Page 1279.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2021
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2021
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 1180.) (May 20).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2021
|
Set for hearing May 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2021
|
April 19 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2021
|
Set for hearing April 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2021
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2021
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 456.) (March 10).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2021
|
Set for hearing March 10.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/08/2020
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 7.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/07/2020
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|