California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB401 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 12, 2021

Enrolled

Bill August 18, 2022

Chaptered

Bill September 13, 2022

Amended

Bill June 6, 2022
Bill March 4, 2021