|
07/16/2021
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 106, Statutes of 2021.
|
|
|
|
07/16/2021
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2021
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/08/2021
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/08/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2282.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/05/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/01/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 30).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/22/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2021
|
Referred to Coms. on B. & P. and L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2021
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1037.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2021
|
Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2021
|
Withdrawn from committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2021
|
May 3 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2021
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2021
|
Set for hearing May 3.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 814.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2021
|
Set for hearing April 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0. Page 573.) (March 22). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2021
|
Set for hearing March 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2021
|
Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D., GOV. & F., and APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
(Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2021
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2021
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|