Assembly
|
08/24/2021
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/07/2021
|
July 7 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/23/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/14/2021
|
Re-referred to Coms. on L. & E. and NAT. RES. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/10/2021
|
Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and L. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/03/2021
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 7. Page 1419.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2021
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2021
|
Set for hearing May 17.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2021
|
May 10 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2021
|
Set for hearing May 10.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 918.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2021
|
Set for hearing April 26.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2021
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2021
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on L., P.E. & R. (Ayes 7. Noes 2. Page 777.) (April 13).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2021
|
Set for hearing April 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2021
|
Re-referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and L., P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2021
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2021
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
(Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2021
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2021
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|