|
10/01/2021
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 447, Statutes of 2021.
|
|
|
|
10/01/2021
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2021
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2021
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 2523.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 19).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/08/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2021
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/17/2021
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1108.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2021
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2021
|
Set for hearing May 3.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 589.) (March 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2021
|
Set for hearing March 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HUMAN S. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 457.) (March 10). Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2021
|
Set for hearing March 10.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2021
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and HUMAN S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
(Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2021
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2021
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|