Assembly
|
08/26/2021
|
August 26 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2021
|
August 19 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/23/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/10/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 9). Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2021
|
Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2021
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1234.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1191.) (May 20).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2021
|
Set for hearing May 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2021
|
April 19 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2021
|
Set for hearing April 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 633.) (March 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2021
|
Set for hearing March 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2021
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
(Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2021
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2021
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|