|
10/01/2021
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 448, Statutes of 2021.
|
|
|
|
10/01/2021
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2021
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2021
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 27. Noes 8. Page 2376.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/02/2021
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/02/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 49. Noes 16. Page 2721.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2021
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2021
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (August 26).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/07/2021
|
July 7 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/22/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/03/2021
|
Referred to Coms. on JUD. and APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2021
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 10. Page 972.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2021
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2021
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 2. Page 859.) (April 20).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2021
|
Set for hearing April 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2021
|
April 13 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2021
|
Set for hearing April 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2021
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2021
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
(Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2021
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2021
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|