Senate
|
02/01/2022
|
Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2022
|
January 20 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2022
|
Set for hearing January 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2021
|
May 20 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2021
|
Set for hearing May 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2021
|
May 17 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2021
|
Set for hearing May 17.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 985.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2021
|
Set for hearing April 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2021
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2021
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. (Ayes 6. Noes 2. Page 875.) (April 21).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2021
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.I.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2021
|
Set for hearing April 21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2021
|
April 7 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2021
|
Set for hearing April 7.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2021
|
Referred to Coms. on B. & F.I. and E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
(Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2021
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2021
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|