|
09/22/2022
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 466, Statutes of 2022.
|
|
|
|
09/22/2022
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2022
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2022
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5343.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2022
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2022
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2022
|
August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/28/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/06/2022
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2022
|
Referred to Com. on E.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/18/2022
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 2775.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/06/2022
|
Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/06/2022
|
From inactive file on motion of Senator Hertzberg.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2021
|
Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Hertzberg.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1191.) (May 20).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2021
|
Set for hearing May 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2021
|
April 5 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2021
|
Set for hearing April 5.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0. Page 588.) (March 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2021
|
Set for hearing March 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2021
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2021
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
(Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2021
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2021
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|