Assembly
|
06/10/2021
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2021
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2021
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1345.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2021
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1192.) (May 20).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2021
|
Set for hearing May 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2021
|
May 10 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2021
|
Set for hearing May 10.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 917.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2021
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2021
|
Set for hearing April 26.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2021
|
April 12 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2021
|
Set for hearing April 12.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2021
|
Referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
(Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2021
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2021
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|