Assembly
|
08/26/2021
|
August 26 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2021
|
June 30 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/22/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/14/2021
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/03/2021
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2021
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 30. Noes 8. Page 1283.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2021
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2021
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1192.) (May 20).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2021
|
Set for hearing May 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2021
|
May 10 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2021
|
Set for hearing May 10.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1. Page 936.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2021
|
Set for hearing April 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2021
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2021
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 9. Noes 3. Page 588.) (March 23).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2021
|
Set for hearing March 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2021
|
Referral to Com. on HUMAN S. rescinded because of the limitations placed on committee hearings due to ongoing health and safety risks of the COVID-19 virus.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2021
|
Referred to Coms. on G.O., JUD., and HUMAN S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
(Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2021
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2021
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|