Assembly | 06/17/2021 | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. | ||
Assembly | 05/13/2021 | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. | ||
Assembly | 03/22/2021 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 03/22/2021 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 569.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 03/15/2021 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 03/11/2021 | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 480.) (March 11). | ||
Senate | 03/02/2021 | Set for hearing March 11. | ||
Senate | 02/25/2021 | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2021 | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) | ||
Senate | 02/22/2021 | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) | ||
Senate | 02/22/2021 | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. | ||
Senate | 02/17/2021 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19. | ||
Senate | 02/16/2021 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |