|
09/30/2022
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 873, Statutes of 2022.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2022
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2022
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2022
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 33. Noes 4. Page 5419.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2022
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2022
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2022
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 3.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2022
|
August 3 set for second hearing. Placed on suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2021
|
August 26 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2021
|
August 19 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/06/2021
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/05/2021
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 30).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/23/2021
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ELECTIONS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/10/2021
|
Referred to Com. on ELECTIONS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2021
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 3. Page 1332.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 1192.) (May 20).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2021
|
Set for hearing May 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2021
|
May 10 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2021
|
Set for hearing May 10.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2021
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 915.) (April 26).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2021
|
Set for hearing April 26.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2021
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2021
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2021
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
(Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2021
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2021
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|