Assembly
|
10/24/2022
|
Returned to Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2022
|
June 28 set for final hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 5. Noes 4.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/18/2022
|
March 22 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/10/2022
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on W.,P., & W.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2021
|
July 1 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2021
|
Referred to Com. on W.,P., & W.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2021
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 886.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 816.) (April 15).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2021
|
Set for hearing April 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2021
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2021
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
(Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2021
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2021
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|